skip to content

Naidoo, Balakrishna Perumal

CPSO#: 23354

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2019

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Cape Town, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Records Management Ltd. 13-1 High Meadow Place Toronto ON M9L 0A3 Toll free: 1-800-775-0093 Website: www.recordsregistry.ca
Instructions: Patients looking to obtain copies of the medical charts should contact above.
Date Received: 11 Apr 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 14 Nov 1972 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jan 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2019