skip to content

Nahvi, Shahab

CPSO#: 95512

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 10 Jun 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 05 Mar 2021

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:Islamic Azad University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Azar Medical Clinic
267 Finch Avenue West
Toronto ON  M2R 1M8
Phone: (647) 992-9277
Fax: (416) 250-1919 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Shahab Nahvi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 18 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Nahvi ( CPSO# 95512 )

Business Address:
Azar Medical Clinic
267 Finch Avenue West
North York ON  M2R 1M8
Phone Number: (647) 992-9277

Business Address:
2867 Ellesmere Road
Toronto ON  M1E 4B9
Phone Number: (416) 284-8131

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Health Network, Centenary Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:16 Dec 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SHAHAB NAHVI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NAHVI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jun 2011
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 Jul 2020
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 09 Jul 2020
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Mar 2021

Concerns

Source: Other
Active Date: June 4, 2021
Expiry Date:
Summary:
CHARGES

Shahab Nahvi was charged with the following offence:

(1) Administer Noxious Thing with Intent to Endanger Life, contrary to Section 245(1) of the Criminal Code of Canada.

Date of charge: May 27, 2021
Place of charge: Toronto, Ontario
Toronto Police Service

 

Source: Other
Active Date: June 4, 2021
Expiry Date:
Summary:
BAIL CONDITIONS

On May 27, 2021, the following conditions of release (bail conditions) were imposed on Shahab Nahvi:

1. Notify specified officer of any change to address or employment.
2. Do not communicate directly or indirectly with specified person.
3. Do not go to places within 500 meters of anywhere the specified person lives, works, or is known to be.
4. Do not possess any weapons.

 

Source: Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: June 18, 2020
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Note: This matter has been appealed to the Health Professions Appeal and Review Board.

Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
Download Full Document (PDF)