skip to content

Nagy, Amr Mohamed Abd Elaziz

CPSO#: 99907

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 30 Jun 2018
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Ain Shams University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Hospital Privileges Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

No Privileges reported.


Hospital Notices

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  June 20, 2018
Expiry Date:  
Summary:  
On June 20, 2018, The Ottawa Hospital notified the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario that the privileges held by Dr. Amir Nagy (Resident, PGY-5, Nephrology) were suspended by The Ottawa Hospital effective June 1, 2018.

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:16 Oct 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 04 Mar 2013 to 19 Apr 2013
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 20 Apr 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 22 Sep 2014
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 16 Oct 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 17 Oct 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 16 Oct 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 17 Oct 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 04 Mar 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Apr 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2018