skip to content

Naguib Khela, Sherine Amin Sobhy

CPSO#: 95227

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Ain Shams University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit # 16
St. George Medical Center
585 Ontario Street South
Milton ON  L9T 2N2
Phone: (905) 693 0044
Fax: (905) 693 8600 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

50 Skyharbour Drive Unit 9
Brampton ON  L6Y 0C1
Canada
Phone: 9058136886
Fax: 9058136889
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Sherine Naguib Khela Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 29 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Naguib Khela ( CPSO# 95227 )

Business Address:
16 - 585 Ontario Street South
Milton ON  L9T 2N2
Phone Number: (905) 693-0044

Business Address:
9 - 50 Skyharbour Drive
Brampton ON  L6Y 0C1
Phone Number: (905) 813-6886

Business Address:
5980 Churchill Meadows Boulevard
Unit 3
Mississauga ON  L5M 7M5
Phone Number: (905) 814-1342

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:19 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SHERINE AMIN SOBHY NAGUIB KHELA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NAGUIB KHELA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2011 to 23 Sep 2011
AVP - Family Medicine

Western University, 24 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2013