skip to content

Nagel, Michael Gerald

CPSO#: 84871

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 Jun 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Health Sciences Antigua, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
4421 Queen Street
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 2L2
Phone: (905) 356-2236 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Michael Nagel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 26 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Nagel ( CPSO# 84871 )

Business Address:
4421 Queen Street
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 2L2
Phone Number: (905) 356-2236

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MICHAEL GERALD NAGEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NAGEL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 28 Aug 2006
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 29 Aug 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Aug 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 Aug 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009