skip to content

Naganobu, Edward Roland

CPSO#: 23244

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 29 Oct 1970

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: E.R. Naganobu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 21 2014

Medical Records Location

Address: 160 Dundurn Street South Hamilton, ON L8P 4K3
Date Received: 23 Apr 2014


Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact: Dr. P.C. Chu Dundurn Medical Group 160 Dundurn Street South Hamilton, Ontario L8P 4K3 Tel: (905) 528-5480 Fax: (905) 389-1104
Date Received: 04 Jun 2009

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:01 Jul 1972 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Oct 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2014