skip to content

Naessens, Veronique

CPSO#: 91968

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Jun 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 10 Sep 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective:12 Oct 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 20 Jul 2009 to 23 Aug 2009
EL - Hematology

University of Toronto, 24 Oct 2011 to 17 Nov 2011
EL - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Aug 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Aug 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Nov 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Sep 2012
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jun 2014