skip to content

Naeem, Omer

CPSO#: 98397

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 31 Dec 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education: University of Health Sciences Lahore, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
189 Hughson Street South
Hamilton ON  L8N 2B6
Phone: 905-802-6791
Fax: 289-919-2510 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Naeem Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 23 2021

Shareholders:
Dr. O. Naeem ( CPSO# 98397 )

Business Address:
No business address available

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre,Regional Rehabilitation Centre Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective:31 Dec 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. OMER NAEEM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NAEEM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 24 Sep 2012
AVP - Neurology

McMaster University, 25 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

McMaster University, 31 Jul 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Dec 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Dec 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Dec 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Dec 2017