skip to content

Nadler, Brian Jacob

CPSO#: 120501

MEMBER STATUS
Suspended as of 31 Mar 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 29 Jan 2021

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Hawkesbury General Hospital
Internal Medicine (hospitalist prac
2E
Phone: 6136321111

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hawkesbury & District General Hospital Hawkesbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:23 Sep 2019 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Feb 2020
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 04 Feb 2020
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 03 Feb 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jan 2021
Suspension of registration imposed: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee Effective: 31 Mar 2021

Practice Restrictions

Registration Status: Suspended     Effective From: 31 Mar 2021


Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee Effective: 31 Mar 2021 Active

Concerns

Source: Other
Active Date: July 16, 2021
Expiry Date:
Summary:
BAIL CONDITIONS

On July 5, 2021, the following conditions of release (bail conditions) were imposed on Brian Nadler:

1. Reside at an address approved by surety.
2. Notify the specified Officer in Charge (or designate) at Hawkesbury OPP of your address in writing within 24 hours of your release.
3. Notify the specified Officer in Charge (or designate) at Hawkesbury OPP of any change in your address.
4. Remain in Canada.
5. Do not associate or communicate in any way, either directly or indirectly, by any physical, electronic or other means, with a) employees of Hawkesbury General Hospital and b) patients and relatives treated at Hawkesbury General Hospital except in the presence of counsel for the purpose of preparing a defence.
6. Do not practice medicine.

 

Source: Other
Active Date: March 26, 2021
Expiry Date:
Summary:
CHARGES

Brian Jacobs Nadler was charged with the following offences:

1.   Four counts of First Degree Murder, on or about March 25, 2021, contrary to Section 235(1) of the Criminal Code of Canada.

Date of charge:  March 26, 2021 and August 11, 2022
Place of charge:  Hawkesbury, Ontario
Ontario Provincial Police