Nadel, Mendel Robert (CPSO#: 25723)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Jun 1973

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 16 Sep 2010

Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M.R. Nadel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 04 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Nadel ( CPSO# 25723 )

Business Address:
422 - 2065 Finch Avenue West
Toronto ON  M3N 2V7
Phone Number: (416) 746-1955

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical records may call: RSRS: 1-888-563-3732
Date Received: 21 Sep 2018

Hospital Privileges Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

No Privileges reported.

Hospital Notices

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  March 8, 2018
Expiry Date:  
Summary:  
On April 13, 2018, Humber River Hospital (HRH) notified the College, pursuant to s. 33 of the Public Hospitals Act and s.85.5 of the Health Professions Procedural Code, Regulated Health Professions Act, that effective March 8, 2018, Dr. Robert Nadel voluntarily restricted his practice at HRH to performing elective caesarean sections for his remaining patients and to providing surgical assistance to obstetrician gynaecologists at HRH.

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 16 Nov 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1972
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Jun 1973
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1973
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 16 Sep 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 16 Sep 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Quality Assurance Committee Effective: 18 May 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Quality Assurance Committee Effective: 30 May 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Quality Assurance Committee Effective: 15 Jun 2018
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 10 Sep 2018
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 10 Sep 2018

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status More Information
member Effective: 10 Sep 2018 Active View Details [+]

            (1of 2)

            As from September 10, 2018, the following terms, conditions and limitations are
            imposed  on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Mendel Robert Nadel, in
            accordance  with  an undertaking and consent Dr. Nadel has given to the College
            of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                               UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
                                            ("Undertaking")
                                                  of
                                        DR. MENDEL ROBERT NADEL
                                             ("Dr. Nadel")
                                                  to
                             COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                            (the "College")



            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "Discipline Committee" means Discipline Committee of the College;
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public;
                  
                  "QAC" means the Quality Assurance Committee of the College.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Nadel, certificate of registration number 25723, am a member of
                  the College.  I acknowledge that concerns have been identified with
                  respect to my practice of obstetrics and gynecology.

            (3)   I, Dr. Nadel, entered into an Undertaking with the College dated June 2,
                  2011, which replaced an Undertaking signed by me on September 16, 2010
                  (the "June 2011 Undertaking").  I acknowledge that the June 2011
                  Undertaking continues in force upon my signing of this Undertaking.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (4)   I, Dr. Nadel, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
                  effective immediately.



            (5)   Practice Restrictions

                  (a)   I, Dr. Nadel, undertake that I shall not engage in the practice of
                        obstetrics and gynecology in any jurisdiction.
                  
            (6)   I, Dr. Nadel, am not currently practicing nor do I have privileges in any
                  jurisdiction.  Going forward, I undertake to inform the College of each
                  and every location that I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                  limited to, any hospitals, clinics, offices, and any Independent Health
                  Facilities with which I am affiliated, in any jurisdiction (collectively
                  my "Practice Location" or "Practice Locations"), within five (5) days of
                  commencing practice at that location

            (7)   I, Dr. Nadel, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere with,
                  unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations and patient charts by a
                  College representative for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with
                  the provisions of this Undertaking.

            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (8)   I, Dr. Nadel, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to
                  in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (9)   I, Dr. Nadel, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
                  responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
                  arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
                  Undertaking. 

            (10)  I, Dr. Nadel, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions
                  of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in
                  reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do
                  so.

            (11)  I, Dr. Nadel, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking
                  to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at
                  any Practice Location ("Chief of Staff" or "Chiefs of Staff").

            (12)  I, Dr. Nadel, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in any one or more of the following:
                  consideration by the QAC, an investigation by the College, or further
                  action by the College, including a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee.

            (13)  I, Dr. Nadel, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 



            (14)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Nadel, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Nadel, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (14)(a) above, the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                        During a College process which identified concerns about Dr.
                        Nadel's practice of obstetrics and gynecology, Dr. Nadel agreed to
                        retire and cease practicing obstetrics and gynecology in any
                        jurisdiction.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (15)  I, Dr. Nadel, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                  appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any person who or institution that
                  may have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my
                  compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

            (16)  I, Dr. Nadel, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent form,
                  attached hereto as Appendix "A" and that the consent forms part of this
                  Undertaking.

            (17)  I, Dr. Nadel, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all
                  Chiefs of Staff with any information arising from the monitoring of my
                  compliance with this Undertaking.

            (18)  I, Dr. Nadel, give my irrevocable consent to any Chief of Staff to
                  disclose to the College, and to one another, all information relevant to
                  this Undertaking and/or relevant for the purposes of monitoring my
                  compliance with this Undertaking.


                        
            (2 of 2)

            As from June 2, 2011,  the  following  terms,  conditions  and  limitation  are
            imposed  on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Mendel Robert Nadel, in
            accordance  with  an undertaking and consent Dr. Nadel has given to the College
            of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                  Effective immediately,  Dr.  Mendel  Robert Nadel shall not engage in any
                  professional encounters with female patients  in  his  office  or  clinic
                  based  practices (i.e. any of his practices outside the hospital), unless
                  the patient  encounter  takes place in the presence of a female regulated
                  health professional.  Dr.Mendel  Robert  Nadel  has further undertaken to
                  engage a colleague at his primary hospital workplace  who is a member of,
                  and acceptable to, the College to act as his supervisor  and  mentor, for
                  at at least one year, and who will report to the College.
                  
                  
                  
                  
                  

Previous Hearings Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 24 Oct 2003
Summary:

 On October 24, 2003, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Nadel to have committed an act of professional 
 misconduct in that, he interrupted or terminated his relationship with a patient during delivery, which 
 having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, 
 dishonourable or unprofessional conduct. 
  
 The Committee ordered the following penalty: 
-Dr. Nadel attend before the panel to be reprimanded, with the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the 
register;  
-The Registrar suspend Dr. Nadel’s certificate of registration for a period of three (3) months; the 
suspension is to be suspended if Dr. Nadel complies with the following terms and conditions within six 
(6) months from today’s date: 
-Dr. Nadel undertakes at his own expense an assessment by the Quality Assurance Committee (Q.A.C.), 
co-operates with their work and abides by the Q.A.C.’s recommendations and complies with any terms, 
conditions and limitations which the Q.A.C. may impose on his certificate of registration. 
 -Dr. Nadel undertakes at his own expense the communications course offered by the College. 
 -Dr. Nadel pay a portion of the College’s costs, fixed in the amount of $2500.00. 

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Jun 16, 2003

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: Member
Active Date: September 10, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Mendel Robert Nadel to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective September 10, 2018:

During a College process which identified concerns about Dr. Nadel’s practice of obstetrics and gynecology, Dr. Nadel agreed to retire and cease practicing obstetrics and gynecology in any jurisdiction.


Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: October 14, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
Download Full Document (PDF)