skip to content

Nadel, Maya

CPSO#: 97689

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 29 Jun 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1110 Sheppard Avenue East
Suite 410
North York ON  M2K 2W2
Phone: (416)-285-3323
Fax: (416)-285-1825 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Maya Nadel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 23 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Nadel ( CPSO# 97689 )

Business Address:
410 - 1110 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2K 2W2
Phone Number: (416) 285-3323

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:22 Jun 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MAYA NADEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NADEL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Apr 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 May 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Apr 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Apr 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 May 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 29 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2015