skip to content

Nadel, Helen Ruth

CPSO#: 31228

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 10 Jun 1998

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Max Rady College of Medicine, University, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 4032 W 32nd Ave Vancouver BC V6S 1Z6
Date Received: 30 May 2019


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



British Columbia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:25 Nov 1982 RCPSC Specialist
Nuclear Medicine Effective:20 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1978 to 30 Jun 1979
Resident 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1979 to 30 Jun 1980
Resident 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1980 to 30 Jun 1981
Resident 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1981 to 30 Jun 1982
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
Resident 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Nov 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Jun 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jun 1998
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2019