skip to content

Nadeem, Syed Muhammad Najaf Ali

CPSO#: 87241

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 10 Sep 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 10 Sep 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Urdu

Education:University of Karachi, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1235 Wilson Ave
North York ON  M3M 0B2
Phone: 416-242-1000 Ext. 47161
Fax: 416-264-5645 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

L122-2075 Bayview Ave
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Canada
Phone: 416-480-4524
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Syed Nadeem Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 18 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Nadeem ( CPSO# 87241 )

Business Address:
Humber River Hospital
1235 Wilson Avenue
North York ON  M3M 0B2
Phone Number: (416) 242-1000


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Nova Scotia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto
Scarborough Health Network, Centenary Hospital Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:10 May 2018 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective:18 Oct 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SYED MUHAMMAD NAJAF ALI NADEEM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NADEEM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 22 Sep 2007
PEAP - CF - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Jul 2008
CF - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Sep 2018