skip to content

Nadarajah, Surabi R

CPSO#: 96370

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 13 Sep 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 13 Sep 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil

Education:All Saints University (Dominica), 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
Hospital
10 Trench St
A100 Tia/Stroke/Neurology Clinic
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone: 9058831212 Ext. 7721
Fax: 9058832246 Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective:15 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SURABI R NADARAJAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NADARAJAH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 23 Sep 2011
AVP - Neurology

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 28 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

McMaster University, 29 Oct 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 28 Oct 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

McMaster University, 29 Oct 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 28 Oct 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

McMaster University, 29 Oct 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Dec 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Sep 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Sep 2018