skip to content

Nada, Ossama Tarek Sayed

CPSO#: 94071

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Jan 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 15 Feb 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 22 Sep 2010
PEAP - CF - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Sep 2011
CF - Ophthalmology

McMaster University, 01 Nov 2011 to 31 Oct 2012
CF - Ophthalmology

McMaster University, 01 Nov 2012 to 31 Jan 2013
CF - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Feb 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jan 2013