skip to content

Nachim, Ilan

CPSO#: 93474

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew, Portuguese, Spanish

Education:Technion-Israel Institute of Technology, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1136 Centre St
Thornhill ON  L4J 3M8
Phone: 1-877-505-0336
Fax: (289) 472-5657 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

25 William Graham Dr.
Aurora ON  L4G 3G3
Canada
Phone: (905) 727-2111
Fax: (905) 841-8978
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

7335 Yonge St
Thornhill ON  L3T 2B2
Canada
Phone: 905 707 7309
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Ilan Nachim Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 30 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Nachim ( CPSO# 93474 )

Business Address:
210-4785 Yonge Street
Aurora ON  L4G 1N1
Phone Number: (905) 841-7007

Business Address:
175 Brentcliffe Road
Toronto ON  M4G 0C5
Phone Number: (800) 387-6198

Business Address:
B2 - 1261 Kennedy Road
Scarborough ON  M1P 2L4

Business Address:
7335 Yonge Street
Thornhill ON  L3T 1P9
Phone Number: (905) 707-7309

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ILAN NACHIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NACHIM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 22 Sep 2010
AVP - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2012