skip to content

Zaman, Neshmi

CPSO#: 103331

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 15 Jul 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Sherman Health and Wellness Centre
9600 Bathurst Street
Unit 300
Vaughan ON  L6A 3Z8
Phone: 289-269-1522
Fax: 905-303-9773 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: K. Zaman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 30 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Zaman ( CPSO# 90195 )
Dr. A. Zaman-Haque ( CPSO# 98500 )
Dr. N. Zaman ( CPSO# 103331)

Business Address:
3502 Danforth Avenue
Toronto ON  M1L 1E1
Phone Number: (647) 984-6172

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:11 Jul 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NESHMI ZAMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZAMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 15 Jul 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2016