skip to content

Stall, Nathan Morton

CPSO#: 98019

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 Jun 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Suite 475 - 600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: 416 586-4800 Ext. 7856
Fax: 416 586-5113 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Bogler and Stall Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 03 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Stall ( CPSO# 98019 )
Dr. C. Bogler ( CPSO# 98412 )

Business Address:
St. Michael's Family Practice
3rd Floor
61 Queen Street East
Toronto ON  M5C 2T2
Phone Number: (416) 867-7428

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
Suite 475
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 864-8000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Rehabilitation Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Medicine Effective: 27 Sep 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NATHAN MORTON STALL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STALL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Geriatric Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Geriatric Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Geriatric Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - Geriatric Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 5 - Geriatric Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016