First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 25 Apr 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 25 Apr 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2015 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2016 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2018 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 26 Aug 2019 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 20 Sep 2019 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Aug 2020 |