skip to content

Sabur, Natasha Fatima

CPSO#: 95123

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 23 Dec 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 23 Dec 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michaels Hospital
Room 6-049
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 360-4000 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

82 Buttonwood Drive
Department of Respiratory Medicine
Toronto ON  M6M 2J5
Canada
Phone: 4162433600 Ext. 2180
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

123 Edward Street, Suite 1011
Toronto ON  M5G 1E2
Canada
Phone: 4168132277
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Sabur Brar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 18 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Brar ( CPSO# 91208 )
Dr. N. Sabur ( CPSO# 95123 )

Business Address:
82 Buttonwood Avenue
Toronto ON  M6M 2J5
Phone Number: (416) 243-3600

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Avenue
Suite 451
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-4800

Business Address:
St Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Suite 6-049
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-6060

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
West Park Healthcare Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 03 Oct 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NATASHA FATIMA SABUR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SABUR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 06 Jun 2011 to 17 Jun 2011
Elective Trainee - Respirology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jun 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Dec 2015