skip to content

Rowe, Neal Ernest

CPSO#: 86445

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland Facu, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital - Civic Campus
1053 Carling Avenue, Section B3
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: 613-761-4500 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Neal E. Rowe Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 16 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Rowe ( CPSO# 86445 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital - Civic Campus
1053 Carling Avenue
Section B3
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 761-4500

Business Address:
499 Raglan Street North
Renfrew ON  K7V 1P6
Phone Number: (613) 432-4821

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Almonte General Hospital Almonte
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa
Renfrew Victoria Hospital Renfrew

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective:30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NEAL ERNEST ROWE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROWE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - General Surgery

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012