skip to content

Rao, Nasa Sanjay Kumar

CPSO#: 106121

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Aug 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 01 Aug 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:St. John's Medical College, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Brockville General Hospital
Outpatient Programme
25 Front Ave W Brockville, ON
Ottawa ON  K1S 5B6
Phone: 613-345-5649
Fax: 613-345-0640 Electoral District: 07

Additional Practice Location(s)

120 Terence Matthews Crescent
Kanata
Ottawa ON  K2M 2B2
Canada
Phone: (613) 831-1105
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

CMAP Health
Suite 110
1390 Prince of Wales Drive
Ottawa ON  K2C-3N6
Canada
Phone: 1-888-691-6111
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: N.S. Rao Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 01 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Rao ( CPSO# 106121)

Business Address:
Health and Counselling Services
1125 University Drive #2600
Ottawa ON  K1S 5B6
Phone Number: (613) 520-6674

Business Address:
Terrace Wellness
260 Terence Matthews Crescent
Suite 201
Ottawa ON  K2M 2B2
Phone Number: (613) 831-1105


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Nova Scotia

United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brockville General Hospital Brockville
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 17 May 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NASA SANJAY KUMAR RAO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAO is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2015
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jun 2015
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 May 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Aug 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2017