skip to content

Petrescu, Nicolae

CPSO#: 90860

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Romanian

Education:University of Toronto, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2075 Bayview Ave
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4475 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Nicolae Petrescu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 20 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Petrescu ( CPSO# 90860 )

Business Address:
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4475

Business Address:
Suite C-304
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone Number: (416) 469-6406

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto
Scarborough Hospital General Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective:30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NICOLAE PETRESCU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PETRESCU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014