skip to content

Patel, Naresh Raghunath

CPSO#: 90130

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 05 Jan 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 03 May 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi, Swahili

Education:Baroda University, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
P O Box 760
22 Mill Street West
Tilbury ON  N0P 2L0
Phone: (519) 682-2307
Fax: (519) 682-9979 Electoral District: 01

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: N.R. Patel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 21 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Patel ( CPSO# 90130 )

Business Address:
22 Mill Street West
P.O BOX 760
Tilbury ON  N0P 2L0
Phone Number: (519) 682-2307

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:10 Dec 2008 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jan 2009
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 May 2013
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 03 May 2013

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
member Effective: 03 May 2013 Active
 

            As from May 3, 2013, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Naresh Raghunath
            Patel, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Patel to the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                  Dr. Naresh Raghunath Patel may not engage in the practice of hyperbaric
                  medicine.

Dear members, your member portal will be unavailable for maintenance and updates from August 5th 5pm to August 9th 9am. We apologize for the inconvenience and appreciate your patience.