skip to content

Markovic, Nevena

CPSO#: 97559

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LHSC University Hospital
Clinical Neurological Sciences
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: 519-663-2961
Fax: 519-663-3635 Electoral District: 02

Additional Practice Location(s)

1405 Edward St
Hearst ON  P0L1N0
Canada
Phone: (705) 362-4291
County: Territorial District of Cochrane
Electoral District: 08

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Markovic Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 02 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Markovic ( CPSO# 97559 )

Business Address:
1405 Edward Street
Hearst ON  P0L 1N0
Phone Number: (705) 362-4291

Business Address:
LHSC University Hospital
Department of Clinical Neurological Sciences
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Business Address:
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
Notre-Dame Hospital Hearst

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective:30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NEVENA MARKOVIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARKOVIC is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

Western University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

Western University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

Western University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

Western University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017