skip to content

Manwani, Neetu Kishan

CPSO#: 101517

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 20 Sep 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 20 Sep 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:Rosalind Franklin University of Med.& Sc, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Britannia Medical Centre
5925 Grossbeak Dr, Unit 9
Mississauga ON  L5N6S5
Phone: 905-821-2466
Fax: 905-824-2466 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Sachin Chopra Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 11 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Chopra ( CPSO# 89052 )
Dr. N. Manwani ( CPSO# 101517)

Business Address:
Civic Heart Centre
Suite 205
10 Cottrelle Boulevard
Brampton ON  L6S 0E2
Phone Number: (905) 497-7747

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:09 Jun 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NEETU KISHAN MANWANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MANWANI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Sep 2016