skip to content

King, Nicole Catherine

CPSO#: 95182

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 27 Sep 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Sep 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: McFadden, Nicole Catherine (used until: 25 Sep 2013 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Max Rady College of Medicine, University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9
Phone: (613) 969-7400 Ext. 2448 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Nicole King Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 26 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. N. King ( CPSO# 95182 )

Business Address:
QHC Belleville General Hospital
265 Dundas Street
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9
Phone Number: (613) 969-7400

Business Address:
QHC Prince Edward County Memorial Hospital
403 Main Street East
Picton ON  K0K 2T0
Phone Number: (613) 476-1008

Business Address:
8 Richmond Park Drive
Napanee ON  K7R 2Z4
Phone Number: (613) 354-3301

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital Napanee
Quinte Healthcare Prince Edward Site Picton
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:27 Aug 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NICOLE CATHERINE KING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KING is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 27 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 28 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 27 Aug 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 28 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 27 Aug 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 28 Aug 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 27 Aug 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 28 Aug 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 27 Aug 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Aug 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Sep 2016