skip to content

Karenkova, Natalia

CPSO#: 98413

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 25 Jun 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 25 Jun 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Russian

Education: Belarusian State Medical University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mackenzie Richmond Hill Hospital
Department of Internal Medicine
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone: (905) 883-1212 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

3200 Major Mackenzie Dr
Maple ON  L6A 4Z3
Canada
Phone: 905-883-1212
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Sennikov and Dr. Karenkova Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 26 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Sennikov ( CPSO# 93351 )
Dr. N. Karenkova ( CPSO# 98413 )

Business Address:
390 Steeles Avenue West
Suite 11-12
Thornhill ON  L4J 6X2
Phone Number: (905) 882-6566

Business Address:
Mackenzie Richmond Hill Hospital
Department of Internal Medicine
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone Number: (905) 883-1212


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital Vaughan
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:25 Jun 2012 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 25 Jun 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 24 Dec 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Dec 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 17 Dec 2013

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 12 Dec 2013 Active
 Dr. Natalia Karenkova may practise medicine independently in internal medicine,
            only.