skip to content

Isaac, Nicole Stephanie

CPSO#: 71092

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2002

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
102-300 Rossland Rd E
Rossland Radiology
Ajax ON  L1Z 0M1
Phone: 9054263111 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

5-2683 Lawrence Ave E
Lawrence-Midland Radiology
Scarborough ON  M1P 2S2
Canada
Phone: 4162881333
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

1757 Sherbrooke St
Apex Diagnostic Services Inc
Peterborough ON  K9K 0G1
Canada
Phone: 7057680333
County: County of Peterborough
Electoral District: 06

47 Liberty St N
Bowmanville ON  L1C 2L8
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Levine Myers Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 04 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Asch ( CPSO# 52679 )
Dr. A. Myers ( CPSO# 61041 )
Dr. G. Dotsikas ( CPSO# 66718 )
Dr. A. Rastogi ( CPSO# 68153 )
Dr. N. Isaac ( CPSO# 71092 )
Dr. G. Donsky ( CPSO# 73822 )
Dr. R. Levine ( CPSO# 78178 )
Dr. M. Khan ( CPSO# 81024 )
Dr. A. Raikhlin ( CPSO# 86803 )
Dr. W. Wei ( CPSO# 86891 )
Dr. E. Ng ( CPSO# 90845 )
Dr. A. Khalatbari ( CPSO# 93796 )
Dr. S. Galante ( CPSO# 98914 )
Dr. J. Lee ( CPSO# 106563)
Dr. R. Lo ( CPSO# 106683)

Business Address:
Baywood X-Ray & Ultrasound
Baywood Medical Clinic
101 - 95 Bayly Avenue
Ajax ON  L1S 7K8
Phone Number: (905) 428-0444

Business Address:
Bowmanville X-Ray & Ultrasound
1101 - 222 King Street East
Bowmanville ON  L1C 1P6
Phone Number: (905) 623-2727

Business Address:
King Street X-Ray & Ultrasound
1290 Keith Ross Court
Oshawa ON  L1H 7K4
Phone Number: (905) 721-7702

Business Address:
Lakeridge Health Oshawa Site
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone Number: (905) 576-8711


Corporation Name: Nicole Isaac Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 04 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Isaac ( CPSO# 71092 )

Business Address:
95 Bayley West
Ajax ON  L1S 2N4
Phone Number: (905) 428-0444

Business Address:
47 Liberty Street South
Bowmanville ON  L1C 2N4
Phone Number: (905) 686-6411

Business Address:
Lakeridge Health - Oshawa Site
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone Number: (905) 686-6411

Business Address:
5 Fairview Mall Dr
North York ON  M2J 2Z1
Phone Number: 416-499-3559

Business Address:
102-2025 Midland Ave
Toronto ON  M1P 3E2
Phone Number: 4162961911

Business Address:
221 Brant Ave
Brantford ON  N3T 3J3

Business Address:
1145 Morningside Ave
Toronto ON  M1B 0A7
Phone Number: 6473500401

Business Address:
353 St Paul Ave
Brantford ON  N3R 4N3

Business Address:
40 Shellington Place
Brantford ON  N3S 0C5

Business Address:
270 King George Rd
Brantford ON  N3R 5L5

Business Address:
60 Hatt St
Dundas ON  L9H 7T6

Business Address:
2-7 Metcalfe St
Trenton ON  K8V 6H3

Business Address:
4190 Finch Ave E
Scarborough ON  M1S 4T7
Phone Number: 4162935940

Business Address:
298 Sheppard Ave E
North York ON  M2N 3B1

Business Address:
4438 Ontario St
Beamsville ON  L0R 1B5

Business Address:
A-2805 Eglinton Ave E
Scarborough ON  M1J 2E1

Business Address:
Lbby-707 Charlotte St
Peterborough ON  K9J 2X5

Business Address:
605 Brock St N
Whitby ON  L1N 8R2

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NICOLE STEPHANIE ISAAC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ISAAC is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2002