skip to content

Aghel, Nazanin

CPSO#: 94670

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Aug 2019
EXPIRY DATE
30 Jun 2022
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 01 Aug 2019
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:BABOL UNIVERSITY OF HEALTH SCIENCES, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton General Hospital
Division of Cardiology
237 Barton St.
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Seyed Hosseini-Moghaddam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 13 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Hosseini Moghaddam ( CPSO# 92031 )
Dr. N. Aghel ( CPSO# 94670 )

Business Address:
St Joseph's Health Centre
Suite B3-420
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone Number: (519) 663-3840

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiology Effective: 01 Aug 2019 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 02 Jan 2011 to 23 Mar 2011
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 24 Mar 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2012 to 31 Mar 2012
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 23 Mar 2016
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 24 Mar 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 22 Mar 2018
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 23 Mar 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 22 Mar 2019
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 23 Mar 2019 to 30 Jun 2019
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 31 Jul 2019
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 02 Jan 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Mar 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2019
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2022

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Aug 2019 Active
             1.    Dr. Nazanin Aghel may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine,
                        Division  of  Cardiology,  McMaster  University, in which Dr. Aghel
                        holds an academic appointment at the rank  of  Assistant Professor,
                        and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires  seven  years  from
                  the  date  of  issuance  or  when  Dr. Aghel no longer holds the academic
                  appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically  expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews  the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the College receives a report indicating that  Dr. Aghel's clinical
                        performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional  conduct,  or
                        academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  Committee  does  not  receive  an  annual report or receives a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when the Committee makes a decision about  Dr.  Aghel's certificate
                        of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment
                        report. 
                  
                  
            Note: This  certificate is issued on August 1, 2019, and expires  on  June  30,
                  2022.   Upon  renewal  of  Dr.  Aghel's  academic appointment at McMaster
                  University, the expiry date can be extended,  subject  to the limitations
                  in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.