skip to content

Abumiddain, Nisreen

CPSO#: 96095

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 16 Jan 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 16 Jan 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Martin Luther University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Bronte Creek Medical
2525 Old Bronte
Unit 190
Oakville ON  L6M 4J2
Phone: 2898350190
Fax: 8559433321 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Abumiddain Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 16 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Abumiddain ( CPSO# 96095 )

Business Address:
5220 Dundas Street
Halton Hills ON  L7L 0J4
Phone Number: (289) 337-3090

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:19 Dec 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NISREEN ABUMIDDAIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABUMIDDAIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 23 Sep 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 19 Sep 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Jan 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 2014