skip to content

Mysliwiec, Bart

CPSO#: 93627

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Woodstock General Hospital
310 Juliana Dr.
Woodstock ON  N4V 0A4
Phone: (519) 421-4211 Ext. 2204
Fax: (519) 537-5951 Electoral District: 02

Additional Practice Location(s)

TDMH
167 Rolph Street
Tillsonburg ON  N4G 4J2
Canada
Phone: (519) 842-3611
County: County of Oxford
Electoral District: 02

Bluewater Health
89 Norman St
Sarnia ON  N7T 6S3
Canada
Phone: (519) 464-4400 Ext. 5214
Fax: (519) 383-8536
County: County of Lambton
Electoral District: 01

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Mysliwiec Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 30 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Mysliwiec ( CPSO# 93627 )

Business Address:
167 Rolph Street
Tillsonburg ON  N4G 4J2

Business Address:
Woodstock General Hospital
310 Juliana Drive
Woodstock ON  N4V 0A4
Phone Number: (519) 421-4211

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bluewater Health Sarnia
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital Tillsonburg
Woodstock General Hospital Woodstock

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:26 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. BART MYSLIWIEC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MYSLIWIEC is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2012