Myers, Mallory Danielle (CPSO#: 98708)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Aug 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Aug 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
570 University Ave E
Unit 7
Waterloo ON  N2K 4P2
Phone: (519) 742-3588
Fax: (519) 742-6379
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M.D. Myers Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 01 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Myers ( CPSO# 98708 )

Business Address:
570 University Avenue East
Suite 7
Waterloo ON  N2K 4P2
Phone Number: (519) 742-3588

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 25 Jul 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MALLORY DANIELLE MYERS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MYERS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 2014