skip to content

Mwamwenda-Heinrich, Escort

CPSO#: 93797

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 08 Jan 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sioux Lookout First Nations Health
Primary Health Care Unit
61 Queen Street
PO Box 1300
Sioux Lookout ON  P8T 1B8
Phone: (807) 737-1802 Electoral District: 09

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: E. Mwamwenda-Heinrich Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 13 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Mwamwenda-Heinrich ( CPSO# 93797 )

Business Address:
Sioux Lookout First Nations Health Authority
Primary Health Care Unit
61 Queen Street PO Box 1300
Sioux Lookout ON  P8T 1B8
Phone Number: (807) 737-1802

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Campbellford Memorial Hospital Campbellford
Clinton Public Hospital Clinton
Quinte Healthcare Prince Edward Site Picton
Sioux Lookout,Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout
South Huron Hospital Exeter
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital Strathroy
Weeneebayko Area Health Authority,Moose Factory Site Moose Factory

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:07 Jan 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ESCORT MWAMWENDA-HEINRICH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MWAMWENDA-HEINRICH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology

Western University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2013 to 12 Jan 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 11 Jan 2016 to 01 Apr 2016
CF - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jan 2014