skip to content

Muthulingam, Shanthi

CPSO#: 89772

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 20 Dec 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 20 Dec 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil

Education:Tamil Nadu Dr M G R Medical University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Eglinton Town Centre Health Clinic
Unit 1
127 Lebovic Ave
Scarborough ON  M1L 4V9
Phone: (416) 701-0127
Fax: (416) 701-9727 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Richpoint Medical Centre
10815 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 3E3
Canada
Phone: (905) 770-3004
Fax: (905) 770-5663
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. S. Muthulingam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 28 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Muthulingam ( CPSO# 89772 )

Business Address:
Eglinton Town Centre Health Clinic
127 Lebovic Avenue
Unit 1
Toronto ON  M1L 0J2
Phone Number: (416) 701-0127

Business Address:
Richpoint Medical Centre
10815 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 3E3
Phone Number: (905) 770-3625

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:11 Dec 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SHANTHI MUTHULINGAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MUTHULINGAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 02 Sep 2008 to 24 Nov 2008
AVP - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 25 Nov 2008 to 01 Sep 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 02 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Nov 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Dec 2012