skip to content

Mutasingwa, Donatus Rutajama

CPSO#: 89814

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 02 Sep 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 03 Sep 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Swahili

Education:University of Dar Es Salaam, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Markham Family Med. Teaching Unit
Suite 202
379 Church Street
Markham ON  L6B 0T1
Phone: (905) 472 2200
Fax: (905) 472 5662 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: D.R. Mutasingwa Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 26 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Mutasingwa ( CPSO# 89814 )

Business Address:
379 Church Street
Suite 202
Markham ON  L6B 0T1
Phone Number: (905) 472-2200

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:01 Sep 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DONATUS RUTAJAMA MUTASINGWA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MUTASINGWA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 02 Sep 2008 to 24 Nov 2008
AVP - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 25 Nov 2008 to 01 Sep 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 02 Sep 2009 to 31 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2010 to 31 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Nov 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Sep 2010