skip to content

Mutabdzic, Dorotea

CPSO#: 95654

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 24 Jan 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 Jan 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1 Quarry Ridge Road, Suite LL4
Barrie ON  L4M7G1
Phone: 705-252-9393 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dorotea Mutabdzic Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 04 2021

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Mutabdzic ( CPSO# 95654 )

Business Address:
1 Quarry Ridge Road, Suite LL4
Barrie ON  L4M G1
Phone Number: 7052529393

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist
General Surgical Oncology Effective:25 Sep 2019 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DOROTEA MUTABDZIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MUTABDZIC is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jan 2019