Mustaneer, Hassan Ali S (CPSO#: 99696)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Faisal University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 14 Dec 2012 to 07 Mar 2013
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 08 Mar 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 13 Oct 2013
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 14 Oct 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Aug 2014
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 18 Dec 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Mar 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015