skip to content

Mussani, Nizar Razakali

CPSO#: 28220

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 27 Mar 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 17 Jun 1976

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Nizar Mussani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 10 2018

Medical Records Location

Address: 17 King St W Stoney Creek, ON L8G 1H1
Date Received: 27 Mar 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:01 Jul 1976 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective:01 Nov 1982 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 27 Mar 2018