skip to content

Musat, Laura

CPSO#: 93832

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Stavar, Laura (used until: 12 Sep 2011 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Romanian

Education:Universitatea 'Lucian Blaga' Din Sibiu, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
One Health
300 Rossland Road East Suite 105
Ajax ON  L1Z 0M1
Phone: (905) 239-7663
Fax: (905) 239-4664 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Laura Musat Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 09 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Musat ( CPSO# 93832 )

Business Address:
105-300 Rossland Road East
Ajax ON  L1Z 0M1
Phone Number: (905) 239-7663

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:26 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. LAURA MUSAT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MUSAT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 23 Sep 2010
AVP - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 24 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2012