skip to content

Musani, Rumina

CPSO#: 94831

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 11 Feb 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 11 Feb 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Aga Khan University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Dept of Laboratory Haematology
11th Floor Eaton Wing 11E-408
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: 4163404800 Ext. 2381 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

6560 Kennedy Rd
Mississauga ON  L5T 2X4
Canada
Phone: (905) 565-0043
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Rumina Musani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 16 2021

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective:13 May 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 Feb 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Feb 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 10 Aug 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 18 Oct 2012
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 26 Oct 2012

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 18 Oct 2012 Active
 Dr.   Rumina  Musani  may  practise  medicine  independently  in  hematological
            pathology, only.