skip to content

Musa, Ihsan Mohammed

CPSO#: 91931

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 28 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 28 Jul 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Baghdad, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Peel Memorial Centre
20 Lynch St
Brampton ON  L6W 2Z8
Phone: (905) 494-2120 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Ihsan Musa Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 15 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Musa ( CPSO# 91931 )

Business Address:
20 Lynch Street
Brampton ON  L6W 2Z8
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



New Brunswick

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre,for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 12 Oct 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. IHSAN MOHAMMED MUSA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MUSA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 2009