Murzin, Diane Louise (CPSO#: 97933)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Feb 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Barrie Community Health Centre
490 Huronia Road
Barrie ON  L4N 6M2
Phone: (705) 734-9690
Fax: (705) 719-4877
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: K.R. Russell Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 01 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Murzin ( CPSO# 97933 )
Dr. K. Russell ( CPSO# 88964 )

Business Address:
Simcoe Muskoka Regional Cancer Centre
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone Number: (705) 728-9090

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 26 Sep 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DIANE LOUISE MURZIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MURZIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 29 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Feb 2018