skip to content

Muruganandam, Padma

CPSO#: 100412

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Feb 2019
EXPIRY DATE
31 May 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Postgraduate Education as of 01 Feb 2019

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Thanjavur Medical College, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Postgraduate Medical Education
McMaster University
Room MDCL - 3101A
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1 Electoral District: 04

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. PADMA MURUGANANDAM shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. MURUGANANDAM is enrolled at MCMASTER UNIVERSITY;

(2) Dr. MURUGANANDAM shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. MURUGANANDAM is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. MURUGANANDAM shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. MURUGANANDAM is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. MURUGANANDAM no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 31 May 2019.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 23 Sep 2013
Assessment Verification Period - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Feb 2019 to 31 May 2019
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 2019