skip to content

Murthy, Yamini

CPSO#: 92275

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 22 Nov 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 22 Nov 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Bangalore University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Murthy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 29 2014

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 23 Nov 2009 to 15 Mar 2010
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 16 Mar 2010 to 22 Nov 2010
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 23 Nov 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Mar 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Mar 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Nov 2010