skip to content

Murtha, Luke William

CPSO#: 112592

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2017
EXPIRY DATE
30 Jun 2021
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Postgraduate Education as of 23 Sep 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Limerick, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Department of Diagnostic Radiology
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 761-4000 Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. LUKE WILLIAM MURTHA shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. MURTHA is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF OTTAWA;

(2) Dr. MURTHA shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. MURTHA is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. MURTHA shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. MURTHA is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. MURTHA no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2021.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 22 Sep 2017
AVP - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2017
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2021