skip to content

Murray, Maureen Elizabeth

CPSO#: 31285

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 29 Jul 1994
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Ottawa, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 08 Jun 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 23 Jul 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Jul 1994