skip to content

Murray, Malcolm Erwin

CPSO#: 18987

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 18 Nov 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 11 Feb 1964

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1956

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Hospital Privileges

No Privileges reported.


Hospital Notices

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  February 14, 2011
Expiry Date:  
Summary:  
On February 22, 2011, Joseph Brant Hospital notified the College that Dr. Malcolm Erwin Murray’s privileges were revoked, effective February 14, 2011.

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective:10 Nov 1964 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Feb 1964
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 18 Nov 2011

Concerns

Source: Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: November 18, 2011
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Effective November 18, 2011, Dr. Murray has resigned from the College and has agreed not to apply or reapply for registration as a physician or for a license to practise medicine in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.