skip to content

Murray, David Andrew

CPSO#: 91824

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 06 Feb 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 06 Feb 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit #10
111-115 Norfolk St.
Guelph ON  N1H4J7
Phone: (519) 763-1914
Fax: (519) 836-4447 Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. David Murray and Dr. Ellen Lee Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 08 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Lee ( CPSO# 91482 )
Dr. D. Murray ( CPSO# 91824 )

Business Address:
170 Metcalfe Street
Guelph ON  N1E 4Y3
Phone Number: (519) 822-0491

Business Address:
60 Woodlawn Road East
Guelph ON  N1H 8M8
Phone Number: (519) 822-5272

Business Address:
Homewood Health Centre
150 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 6K9
Phone Number: (519) 824-1010

Business Address:
Suite 302
85 Norfolk Street
Guelph ON  N1H 4J4
Phone Number: (519) 822-1871

Business Address:
115 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 4J4
Phone Number: (519) 837-6440

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Guelph General Hospital Guelph

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:31 Dec 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DAVID ANDREW MURRAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MURRAY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 08 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 09 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 16 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 17 Dec 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Feb 2015