skip to content

Murray, Catherine Alexandra

CPSO#: 101281

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jun 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 01 Jun 2019

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:St George's University of Grenada, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 24 Dec 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CATHERINE ALEXANDRA MURRAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MURRAY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 23 Sep 2013
Assessment Verification Period - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 24 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 24 Dec 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 25 Dec 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2018 to 24 Dec 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Dec 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2019